RAYAAN BROWN FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer emotional support and comfort directly to children with cancer and histiocytosis, as well as their parents staying on the children's cancer ward. We wish to enhance their emotional and psychological health through the provision of gifts. We also plan to support bereaved parents with memorial gifts to remember their child.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 11 May 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHRADHA BROWN | Chair | 11 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
PRECINA PANKHANIA | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
AARTI LODHIA | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
MISS ANU KHANDELWAL | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.40k | £3.08k | £2.76k | £500 | £22 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.77k | £2.03k | £6.44k | £2.50k | £89 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 February 2025 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 February 2025 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 September 2024 | 221 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 September 2024 | 221 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 April 2023 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 April 2023 | 71 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 March 2022 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 March 2022 | 46 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 March 2021 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 March 2021 | 55 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 May 2018
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN SUFFERING FROM CHILDHOOD CANCERS, IN PARTICULAR HISTIOCYTOSIS, AND THE BEREAVED FAMILIES/CARERS OF SUCH CHILDREN BY: A) THE PROVISION OF GIFTS AND ACTIVITIES TO ENHANCE THEIR PHYSICAL, EMOTIONAL AND PSYCHOLOGICAL HEALTH, EASE THEIR SUFFERING AND/OR PROVIDE COMFORT. B) SUPPORTING BEREAVED PARENTS OF CHILDREN WITH CANCER AND HISTIOCYTOSIS BY ARRANGING AN ANNUAL MEMORIAL EVENT. C) RAISING AWARENESS OF CHILDHOOD CANCERS, IN PARTICULAR HISTIOCYTOSIS, AND PROVIDING SUPPORT AND INFORMATION TO FAMILIES THAT ARE GOING THROUGH IT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Oxburgh Close
LOUGHBOROUGH
LE11 4TG
- Phone:
- 07479296116
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window