Financial history ST FRANCIS SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 511959
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £11.05k £3.65k £11.83k £26.54k £18.41k
Total expenditure £10.43k £3.49k £9.70k £21.92k £20.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £250 N/A £1.35k £5.10k N/A