Trustees ST FRANCIS SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 511959

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
kirsten hartley | Trustee | 20 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
poppy aldridge | Trustee | 20 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Annette Grogan | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
TRACY WILKINSON | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
adam furniss | Trustee | 13 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Rushden | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul trevelyan | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
ian Fletcher | Trustee | 02 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN COOKE | Trustee | 23 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
MRS C NEWMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.