Financial history THE BOWES RAILWAY COMPANY LIMITED

Charity number: 511961
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £36.66k £93.46k £67.56k £66.34k £54.34k
Total expenditure £42.41k £47.34k £81.43k £79.11k £51.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £27.32k N/A
Income from government grants £7.20k £5.00k £15.50k £27.32k £11.00k