THE BRISTOL REGGAE ORCHESTRA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE ART OF MUSIC, PARTICULARLY REGGAE AND MUSIC OF JAMAICAN ORIGIN FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY PERFORMING SUCH MUSIC TO THE PUBLIC AND PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES TO DEVELOP MUSICAL SKILLS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 02 October 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Arusha McKenzie | Chair | 14 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Scott | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wesley Guincahrd-Cox | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Geraldine Folland | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kristian Sharpe | Trustee | 14 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Millwood | Trustee | 12 May 2020 |
|
|||||
N DAYKIN | Trustee | 03 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
K BRANCH | Trustee | 03 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
B CHAMBERS | Trustee | 03 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.19k | £2.42k | £8.61k | £33.00k | £24.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.84k | £2.09k | £2.89k | £15.48k | £35.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £4.50k | £22.00k | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 24 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 24 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 02 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ART OF MUSIC, PARTICULARLY REGGAE AND MUSIC OF JAMAICAN ORIGIN FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY PERFORMING SUCH MUSIC TO THE PUBLIC AND PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES TO DEVELOP MUSICAL SKILLS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Malcolm X Community Centre
141 City Road
BRISTOL
BS2 8YH
- Phone:
- 0791 001 7009
- Email:
- aaron.rp.lee@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window