THE FRIENDS OF THE LANCASHIRE YOUTH AND SCHOOLS CONCERT BANDS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raise funds to assist with the musical education of the Lancashire Youth & Schools' Concert bands and to provide funds to help with large concert tours etc. Providing a tuck shop and preparing meals on the days of practice.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- 03 November 1981: Standard registration
- 25 May 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
- 25 May 2023: Funds transferred to 1181507 FRIENDS OF THE LANCASHIRE COUNTY ENSEMBLES
- FRIENDS OF THE LANCASHIRE YOUTH CONCERT BAND (LYCB) (Working name)
- FRIENDS OF THE LANCASHIRE SCHOOLS SYMPHONIC WIND BAND (Previous name)
- FRIENDS OF THE LANCASHIRE SCHOOLS' SYMPHONIC WIND BAND (Previous name)
- FRIENDS OF THE LANCASHIRE STUDENTS CONCERT BAND (Previous name)
- FRIENDS OF THE LANCASHIRE YOUTH CONCERT BAND (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £941 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £807 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 27 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 OCTOBER 1981 AS AMENDED 18 APRIL 1989, 9 APRIL 1994, 6 MARCH 2004 AND 16 OCTOBER 2010.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, ADVANCE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE LANCASHIRE YOUTH CONCERT BAND (L.Y.C.B.) AND THE LANCASHIRE SCHOOLS CONCERT BAND (L.S.C.B.) IN THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN SUCH WAYS AS THE ASSOCIATION SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME. THE OBJECTS SHALL AT ALL TIMES BE NON - POLITICAL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window