Accounts and annual returns PENTECOST FIRE RESTORATION CHURCH INTERNATIONAL

Charity Number: 1178224
Charity reporting is up to date (95 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 05 March 2025 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 06 May 2025 95 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 19 September 2024 232 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 19 September 2024 232 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 18 July 2023 168 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 18 July 2023 168 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 10 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 26 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window