Financial history PENTECOST FIRE RESTORATION CHURCH INTERNATIONAL

Charity Number: 1178224
Charity reporting is up to date (95 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £11.62k £3.41k £19.18k £22.02k £14.66k
Total expenditure £11.98k £3.33k £16.09k £23.21k £15.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A