PAKISTAN ALLIANCE FOR GIRLS EDUCATION UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pakistan Alliance for Girls Education promotes Girls Education in Pakistan through Advocacy, Policy, Resource mobilisation and targeted programs to support young girls and women coming from deprived backgrounds facing various challenges including poverty, culture and lack of access to education and personal development opportunities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Pakistan
Governance
- 09 October 2019: Standard registration
- PAGE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mohammed Kassim Gaffar | Chair | 07 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Shumaila Kisat | Trustee | 11 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ayub Jamil Dosani | Trustee | 20 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
NADIA BUKHARI | Trustee | 20 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUNIYA QURESHI | Trustee | 20 May 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/12/2020 | 30/12/2021 | 30/12/2022 | 30/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £94.00k | £81.00k | £139.30k | £40.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £125.00k | £101.00k | £99.85k | £81.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 December 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 December 2021 | 26 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2021 | 26 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14 SEP 2018 AS AMENDED ON 09 SEP 2019
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF GIRLS AGED 5 TO 16 IN PAKISTAN, FROM DEPRIVED BACKGROUNDS WHO WOULD OTHERWISE BE UNABLE TO ACCESS EDUCATIONAL AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT OPPORTUNITIES, BY THE PROVISION OF NEEDS BASED PROGRAMS AND GRANTS IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, IN COLLABORATION WITH PAKISTAN ALLIANCE FOR GIRLS EDUCATION IN PAKISTAN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
211a
peel house
34-44 london road
211
morden
MORDEN
- Phone:
- 0013127158061
- Email:
- info@page.org.pk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window