Financial history STREET ORCHESTRA LTD

Charity Number: 1178626
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £39.94k £17.30k £21.16k £31.99k £125
Total expenditure £46.62k £18.00k £19.36k £35.04k £1.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £8.10k N/A £11.00k £30.00k N/A