Accounts and annual returns ALDWINIANS RUGBY UNION FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity Number: 1179794
Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 04 December 2024 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 04 December 2024 4 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2023 22 May 2024 174 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

22 May 2024 174 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2022 04 January 2023 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 04 January 2023 35 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2021 01 December 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 01 December 2021 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2020 30 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 30 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window