Financial history THE IAN AND CLARE MATTIOLI CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1178834
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £212.25k £276.03k £369.30k £340.30k £128.86k
Total expenditure £51.41k £117.83k £245.25k £624.81k £273.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A