THE CHURCH OF JESUS CHRIST (APOSTALIC)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDE FAITH SUPPORT TO THE LOCAL AND WIDER COMMUNITY THROUGH THE CHRISTIAN FAITH. CREATING A SAFE PLACE OF WORSHIP OPEN TO ALL, AND FREE FROM DISCRIMINATION. WE SUPPORT THE BUILDING OF A RELATIONSHIP WITH GOD THROUGH WORSHIP, PREACHING AND OUTREACHING.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 October 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hackney
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 15 June 2018: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KAY WILSON | Chair | 10 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
PETER HAMILTON | Trustee | 10 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
PAUL HAMILTON | Trustee | 10 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/10/2019 | 30/10/2020 | 30/10/2021 | 30/10/2022 | 30/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.77k | £2.48k | £5.36k | £8.57k | £7.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.54k | £4.10k | £0 | £3.33k | £5.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 October 2023 | 25 October 2024 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 October 2022 | 30 January 2024 | 153 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 October 2021 | 12 September 2022 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 October 2020 | 28 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 October 2019 | 30 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 OCT 2017
Charitable objects
1.TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH THROUGH WORSHIP AND PREACHING. 2.TO BELIEVE IN GOD AND TO CREATE A PLACE OF WORSHIP OPEN TO ALL, AND FREE FROM DISCRIMINATION. 3.TO BUILD A RELATIONSHIP WITH GOD THROUGH WORSHIP, REVERENCE AND SERVING GOD AND TO FULFILL THE GREAT COMMISSION OF JESUS CHRIST. 4.TO DO ANY AND ALL THINGS RELATED TO AND IN CONNECTION WITH THE CARRYING OUT OF THE OBJECT AND PURPOSE HEREIN ABOVE SET FORTH. 5.TO GUARD THE FAITH, UNITY, AND DISCIPLINE OF THE CHURCH; RAISING AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF RELIGIOUS BELIEFS AND PRACTICES. 6.CARRYING OUT RELIGIOUS DEVOTIONAL ACTS, MISSIONARY AND OUTREACH WORK AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 PENTIRE ROAD
LONDON
E17 4BY
- Phone:
- 07796305260
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window