NORTHAMPTONSHIRE AREA QUAKER MEETING OF THE RELIGIOUS SOCIETY OF FRIENDS (QUAKERS) IN BRITAIN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We hold meetings in Northampton, Kettering, Wellingborough. We make our Meetings for Worship available to all and welcome those who come. We encourage all enquirers, and occasionally we run evening meetings to answer questions and provide more information. In addition there are opportunities to join bible study and discussion groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 05 October 2018: CIO registration
- NORTHAMPTONSHIRE AREA MEETING (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN THEODORE STURGE | Chair | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charles Patrick Braithwaite | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Robert Bertin | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Annette Christine Candy | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Olaseni Alaka | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Halliwell | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Mary Rees | Trustee | 12 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £154.76k | £85.22k | £52.86k | £67.82k | £79.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £95.72k | £64.27k | £56.55k | £123.14k | £77.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 05 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF NORTHAMPTONSHIRE AREA MEETING IS THE FURTHERANCE OF THE GENERAL RELIGIOUS AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE RELIGIOUS SOCIETY OF FRIENDS (QUAKERS) IN BRITAIN IN THE AREA OF NORTHAMPTONSHIRE AREA MEETING AND BEYOND.
Contact information
- Address:
-
NORTHAMPTONSHIRE QUAKERS
QUAKER MEETING HOUSE
WELLINGTON STREET
NORTHAMPTON
NN1 3AS
- Phone:
- 07974096950
- Website:
-
northamptonshirequakers.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window