TREE-MENDOUS LEARNING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance in life/help young people through the provision of recreational/leisure activities provided in the interest of social welfare, designed to improve their conditions or life. Providing support and activities which develop their skills & capabilities to enable them to participate in society. To advance the education of young people in protection of the environment. To improve their health
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 20 December 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALISON DICKINSON | Chair | 20 December 2018 |
|
|||||
STELLA JOAN LEWSLEY | Trustee | 20 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
CLARE SOWERBY | Trustee | 20 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLA STORY | Trustee | 06 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.00k | £10.89k | £12.57k | £15.14k | £17.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.00k | £10.89k | £12.57k | £15.14k | £17.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Dec 2018
Charitable objects
1)TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE IN NORTH CUMBRIA THROUGH: A: THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OR LIFE; B: PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPABILITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN NORTH CUMBRIA IN THE PROTECTION AND CONSERVATION OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT BY PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR LEARNING IN THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT. 3) TO ADVANCE THE HEALTH AND WELLBEING BEING OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN NORTH CUMBRIA THROUGH ACTIVE ENJOYMENT OF GREEN SPACES.
Area of benefit
NORTH CUMBRIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
JACKSON RIGG
LONGTOWN
CARLISLE
CA6 5TZ
- Phone:
- 07748964283
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window