MERSEYSIDE ASBESTOS VICTIMS SUPPORT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer completely free and confidential services to victims of asbestos related diseases and their families on Merseyside and further afield, which include: DWP and other state benefits Support Group meetings Members meetings Fundraising activities and events Educational days Home visits
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 May 2018: CIO registration
- 24 February 2021: Funds received from 1033724 MERSEYSIDE ASBESTOS VICTIMS SUPPORT GROUP
- MAVS (Working name)
- MAVSG (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Irene Leonard | Trustee | 29 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Lee | Trustee | 29 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Derek Maylor | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
William Paul Lafferty | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Bimpson | Trustee | 16 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
KENNETH NEWTON | Trustee | 20 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £160.36k | £148.55k | £134.84k | £136.18k | £141.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £151.00k | £130.47k | £136.03k | £140.72k | £132.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £3.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 April 2025 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 April 2025 | 66 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 July 2024 | 166 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 July 2024 | 166 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 April 2023 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 February 2023 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 September 2022 | 218 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 September 2022 | 218 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 February 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 February 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 14 May 2018
Charitable objects
1.TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUFFERERS FROM ASBESTOS RELATED DISEASES IN MERSEYSIDE AND ITS ENVIRONS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EMOTIONAL SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE. 2. TO RELIEVE THE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OF SUCH PERSONS & THEIR FAMILIES BY THE PROVISION OF FREE ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE, ESPECIALLY TO THOSE WHO WOULD OTHERWISE BE UNABLE TO OBTAIN ANY. 3. TO RELIEVE THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL ILL-HEALTH OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN MERSEYSIDE AND ITS ENVIRONS SUFFERING BEREAVEMENT OR LOSS THROUGH ASBESTOS RELATED DISEASE BY THE PROVISION OF EMOTIONAL SUPPORT AND PRACTICAL ADVICE TO SUCH PERSONS. 4. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELEVANT TO ASBESTOS RELATED DISEASES. 5. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELEVANT TO THE HAZARDS POSED TO HEALTH BY ASBESTOS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
108 Century Buildings
Brunswick Business Park
Tower Street
LIVERPOOL
L3 4BJ
- Phone:
- 01512361895
- Email:
- info@mavsg.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window