Financial history BEAUTIFUL MIND

Charity number: 1179490
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £6.55k £10.15k £32.50k £17.77k £17.00k
Total expenditure £6.45k £8.99k £34.90k £1.69k £17.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £620 N/A £27.70k £17.58k £17.00k