MOTHER TO MOTHER LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF POST-NATAL WOMEN AND THEIR FAMILIES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND PRACTICAL ADVICE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £7,766 from 2 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Barnet
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 02 November 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shlomie Mordechai Rokach | Trustee | 27 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Hayden Rauf | Trustee | 05 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
JOSHUA HEZEKIAH MORHAIM | Trustee | 29 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.10k | £39.19k | £114.67k | £41.04k | £209.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.54k | £20.28k | £55.77k | £114.85k | £165.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £7.77k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 17 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 17 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29 SEP 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 02 NOV 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF POST-NATAL WOMEN AND THEIR FAMILIES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND PRACTICAL ADVICE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Hayling Way
OneStonegrove Community Centre
HA8 8BN
- Phone:
- 02037450955
- Email:
- info@mtom.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window