LITTLE FISH THEATRE

Charity number: 1179172
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Little Fish supports difficult to reach young people through the transformative power of theatre and community arts. Its work is designed to enable young people to question their aspirations and beliefs, empowering them to develop both their social and personal life skills. Participants are inspired to become cultural consumers or creators, actively shaping a new social & political landscape.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £131,592
Total expenditure: £230,723

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 July 2018: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alexander Mark Cooke Chair 12 July 2018
None on record
Cleve Jackson Trustee 22 October 2019
None on record
Sheryl Anita Malcolm Trustee 13 November 2018
None on record
Lucinda Jane Seddon Trustee 19 September 2018
None on record
Dr Amanda Jain Stuart Fisher Trustee 12 July 2018
None on record
Suha Al-Khayyat Trustee 12 July 2018
FULL HOUSE THEATRE
Received: On time
Ben Miles Trustee 12 July 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £353.63k £387.74k £232.88k £217.50k £131.59k
Total expenditure £245.04k £224.39k £242.25k £183.53k £230.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £38.50k £54.98k £18.41k
Income from government grants £16.00k £44.88k N/A £54.98k £15.90k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 20 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 20 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 08 March 2024 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 08 March 2024 37 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 29 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 29 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 25 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 27 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Forum at Greenwich
Trafalgar Road
LONDON
SE10 9EQ
Phone:
02082691123