COLDFALL SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance education for the public benefit of the pupils at Coldfall Primary School by providing facilities or equipment or activities which support the school and advance the education of the pupils.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Haringey
Governance
- 17 April 2018: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
George Wainwright | Trustee | 08 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sebastian Worbs | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sinead Queeney | Trustee | 03 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Clive Engelbert | Trustee | 03 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Douglas Blackwood | Trustee | 02 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.55k | £4.35k | £965 | £961 | £1.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £220 | £230 | £240 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 12 February 2024 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 12 February 2024 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 22 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 22 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE PUPILS AT COLDFALL PRIMARY SCHOOL BY PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Coldfall Primary School
Coldfall Avenue
London
N10 1HS
- Phone:
- 02088830608
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window