SYNERGY DANCE OUTREACH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
All-inclusive dance, yoga, singing, performance and fitness programs for Special Educational Needs and the disability community. The charity promotes physical and mental health and wellbeing through lifelong participation in dance, fitness, yoga and related wellbeing activities for all, where neither finance, fitness, ability, disability or family circumstance are barriers to participation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Surrey
- West Sussex
Governance
- 31 October 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARY UNGOED-THOMAS | Trustee | 31 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
RACHELLE ALEXANDRA FRANKLIN | Trustee | 31 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA WHITTAKER | Trustee | 31 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.31k | £105.51k | £64.49k | £90.81k | £121.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.14k | £83.95k | £104.38k | £83.38k | £113.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.51k | £105.30k | N/A | £43.80k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 23 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 23 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 31 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE BY PROVIDING SOCIAL DANCE ACTIVITIES AND EVENTS WHICH ARE ACCESSIBLE TO ALL. (2) TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND APPRECIATION OF THE PUBLIC IN DANCE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY ENCOURAGING HIGH STANDARDS IN DANCE, CHOREOGRAPHING AND DELIVERING HIGH QUALITY PERFORMANCES IN CONTRIBUTION TO CONCERTS AND THEATRE. (3) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE ART OF DANCE, PARTICULARLY THROUGH WORKING WITH PRE-SCHOOLS, SCHOOLS, PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATIONS, AFTER SCHOOL AND HOLIDAY CLUBS, COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES, LIBRARIES, GALLERIES AND MUSEUMS, SPORTS CLUBS AND UNIFORMED ORGANISATIONS. (4) TO ADVANCE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH AND WELLBEING OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC THROUGH DANCE ACTIVITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
QUEEN ELIZABETH PARK 2 FORSTER ROAD
GUILDFORD
GU2 9AF
- Phone:
- 07713254260
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window