SUSTAINABLE SUSSEX

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sustainable Sussex supports people who find accessing the workplace difficult through providing real-work experience and education on and around Sompting Estate. Our activities include gardening, building, carpentry, animal care, mindfulness, crafts and making value added products and selling them as part of our social enterprise Sussex Chilli Farm.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 15 April 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LIANE WEBB | Chair | 15 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Ruth Elizabeth Kenward | Trustee | 22 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
KEITH LAWRENCE COLIN | Trustee | 15 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
MICHAEL GUY TRISTRAM | Trustee | 15 April 2019 |
|
|||||||||||
GERARD NOEL JAMES CRONIN | Trustee | 15 April 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.80k | £9.40k | £26.86k | £24.84k | £33.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.90k | £10.39k | £14.49k | £24.76k | £42.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
3.1 THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN THE COUNTIES OF WEST SUSSEX AND EAST SUSSEX FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: 1) PROVIDING SUPPORTED VOLUNTEERING, REAL-WORK EXPERIENCE, EDUCATION AND EMPLOYMENT; AND 2) DELIVERING SUCH SERVICES IN WAYS WHICH ENHANCE PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SOCIAL WELFARE. 3.2 TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY).
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sompting Estate Office
Lambleys Lane
WORTHING
BN14 9JX
- Phone:
- 07598411428
- Email:
- keith@sustainablesussex.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window