DAWDON YOUTH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Open 79 hours per week over 7 days, providing a welcoming place for 450 individuals, groups and local residents of all ages to access a wide range of recreational and leisure activities, projects and supportive interventions each week. We make a practical and positive difference by addressing the root causes of multiple deprivation and work towards overcoming social exclusion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £22,734 from 5 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Durham
Governance
- 28 March 2018: CIO registration
- 12 July 2019: Funds received from 510881 DAWDON YOUTH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LEANNE CATHERINE PAGE | Chair | 30 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN SHAW | Trustee | 22 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARK COGDEN | Trustee | 15 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
KERRY PARKER | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £215.27k | £165.58k | £165.58k | £130.70k | £190.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £125.61k | £167.10k | £167.10k | £150.25k | £160.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £13.49k | £25.76k | £22.73k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 February 2024 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 February 2024 | 105 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 January 2023 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 January 2023 | 66 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 28 Mar 2018
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF DAWDON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
DAWDON YOUTH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE
QUEEN ALEXANDRA ROAD
SEAHAM
SR7 7NH
- Phone:
- 01915131777
- Email:
- marion@dawdonycc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window