Financial history St Richard's CE Preschool

Charity number: 1178927
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £150.15k £129.33k £146.11k £118.38k £126.92k
Total expenditure £130.63k £139.93k £138.61k £78.06k £121.64k
Income from government contracts £101.07k £109.02k £138.49k £116.74k £117.42k
Income from government grants £34.52k £6.24k N/A N/A £5.75k