Accounts and annual returns CYSTIC FIBROSIS SUPPORTERS (BROMLEY)

Charity number: 1181381
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 09 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 09 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 09 April 2024 161 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 09 April 2024 161 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 09 April 2024 526 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 09 April 2024 526 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 October 2022 352 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 18 October 2022 352 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 19 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window