Financial history PATIENT SAFETY LEARNING

Charity number: 1180689
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £575.86k £487.43k £585.09k £486.55k £577.03k
Total expenditure £454.22k £424.29k £525.88k £588.96k £538.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £575.02k N/A £539.09k N/A £450.09k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £6.00k N/A £36.00k
Income - Charitable activities £829 N/A £0 N/A £88.70k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment £11 N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Other £0 N/A £40.00k N/A £2.24k
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £454.22k N/A £525.88k N/A £538.97k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A £24.01k N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 N/A £0