DERBYSHIRE FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The education of women in Derbyshire through various activities, meetings and outings. Inspiring women through friendship and cooperation.Working within communities for the improvement of people's lives and environments.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
29 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 21 June 2018: CIO registration
- 13 November 2019: Funds received from 228388 DERBYSHIRE FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES
- 16 November 2020: Funds received from 1037422 MILTON WOMEN'S INSTITUTE (DERBYSHIRE)
- 23 September 2021: Funds received from 518837 BREADSALL WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
- 06 March 2023: Funds received from 1025016 SUDBURY WOMEN'S INSTITUTE (DERBYSHIRE)
- DFWI (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne Bellamy | Chair | 13 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Bailey | Trustee | 02 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Fisher | Trustee | 07 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Vivien Rhodes | Trustee | 13 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET SCOTT | Trustee | 13 March 2018 |
|
|||||
DIANE LOUISE SMILES | Trustee | 13 March 2018 |
|
|||||
Judith Marjorie Ruth Stanhope | Trustee | 13 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
LINDA ANN SINGLETON | Trustee | 13 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Linda Anne Odell | Trustee | 13 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Fay Rumley | Trustee | 13 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Hall | Trustee | 13 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £487.50k | £152.45k | £150.92k | £203.80k | £192.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £477.16k | £170.89k | £106.07k | £211.55k | £214.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 19 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 19 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 09 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 09 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 03 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 03 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 21 JUN 2018 AMENDED ON 14 APR 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE FEDERATION ARE TO FURTHER THE PURPOSES OF THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION IN DERBYSHIRE AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
DERBYSHIRE FEDERATION OF
WOMENS INSTITUTES
DERBYSHIRE HOUSE
SHERWIN STREET
DERBY
DE22 1GP
- Phone:
- 01332342596
- Email:
- office@dfwi.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window