Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT EDMUND, CHINGFORD
Charity number: 1178139

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Deborah Ruth Holmes | Chair | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Frances Field LLB, MEd | Trustee | 08 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nogie Irabor | Trustee | 08 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Laura Russell | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Cecilia Greenidge | Trustee | 28 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Sidney White | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Charlotte N Skinner | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE ALFRED DUBERRY | Trustee | 13 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN GEORGE GLOVER | Trustee | 24 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE ELIZABETH SETCHFIELD | Trustee | 27 April 2003 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH RUTH WATSON B.ED. | Trustee | 24 April 2002 |
|
|||||
ANDREW JOHN EDWARD SETCHFIELD | Trustee | 24 April 2002 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.