THE COMMUNITY OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN AT WANTAGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Christian religion for the benefit of the public, in particular through maintaining St Mary's Convent Wantage and sustaining the religious community there, and promoting the religious life generally; for public benefit, to support education through projects with an Anglican character or an Anglican partner; to assist and support projects for vulnerable women suffering from illness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England
- Botswana
- India
- South Africa
Governance
- 10 January 2019: CIO registration
- CSMV (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison Jestico | Chair | 07 March 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||
Professor Pauline M Rudd | Trustee | 04 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Rev Philippa Judith White | Trustee | 04 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Gordon Joyner | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Sr Elizabeth Jane Tweddle | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Rev DARREN William MCFARLAND | Trustee | 02 March 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||
Rev Peter John Groves | Trustee | 02 March 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||
Michele Annette Cynthia Foot | Trustee | 12 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Ven Christine Allsopp | Trustee | 07 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Rt Rev OLIVIA JOSEPHINE GRAHAM | Trustee | 10 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £339.01k | £286.76k | £376.09k | £338.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £1.71m | £1.75m | £1.80m | £1.81m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Jan 2019
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH MAINTAINING ST MARY’S CONVENT, WANTAGE AND SUSTAINING THE RELIGIOUS COMMUNITY THERE, AS WELL AS THE PROMOTION OF THE RELIGIOUS LIFE GENERALLY, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINE OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND AND OF THOSE CHURCHES IN COMMUNION WITH THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND. 2. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, BY PROMOTING AND SUPPORTING EDUCATION IN INSTITUTIONS OR THROUGH PROJECTS WHICH HAVE AN ANGLICAN CHARACTER OR THROUGH JOINT ENTERPRISES WHICH INCLUDE AN ANGLICAN PARTNER, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT FROM TIME TO TIME. 3. TO ASSIST IN THE CARE AND TREATMENT OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM ILLNESS OF ANY DESCRIPTION OR IN NEED OF REHABILITATION, IN PARTICULAR PROJECTS WHICH CARE FOR VULNERABLE WOMEN AND GIRLS, THROUGH THE PROVISION BY SUCH PROJECTS OF FACILITIES FOR WORK AND RECREATION AND THE PROMOTION OF HEALTH EDUCATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Community of St. Mary the Virgin
St. Marys Convent
Denchworth Road
WANTAGE
OX12 9AU
- Phone:
- 01235 763141
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
csmv.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window