COMMUNITY BUDDIES

Charity number: 1182280
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Providing practical support to groups in those communities seeking to organise for themselves events and activities that address their recreational, leisure and educational needs; Engaging residents in those communities in opportunities to learn new skills and develop their own projects, events and activities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £110

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Darlington
  • East Riding Of Yorkshire
  • North Yorkshire
  • Redcar And Cleveland
  • Stockton-on-tees

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 March 2019: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Olwy n Mary Richardson Trustee 29 July 2020
None on record
Anne Mary Ash Trustee 31 October 2019
None on record
David Ronald James Smith Trustee 30 October 2019
None on record
Sarah Anne Beniams Trustee 29 July 2019
None on record
Helen Jane Piercy Trustee 29 July 2019
None on record
STEPHEN O'BRIEN Trustee 29 July 2019
None on record
ANDREW CHARLES POWELL Trustee 29 July 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £7.00k £13.55k £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £140 £140 £9.71k £110
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 14 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 14 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 17 June 2024 138 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 17 June 2024 138 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 03 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 03 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 09 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Broadacres Housing Association
Broadacres House
Mount View
NORTHALLERTON
North Yorkshire
DL6 2YD
Phone:
01609767963
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available