JUST RIDE SOUTHEND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Just ride Southend provides all ability cycling in a safe environment. Using adapted cycles on an athletics track based in Southend on sea Essex. We also provide training for volunteers which includes mechanical, social and cycling skills.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
55 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Southend-on-sea
Governance
- 06 August 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Andrew Waymark | Chair | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roana Katrina Bennett | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Hamish Crowther Dixon | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Li | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOHN GRETTON | Trustee | 16 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER OTTOWAY | Trustee | 16 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
AMBER EVERSON | Trustee | 16 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
HELEN BANKS | Trustee | 16 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
PETER SHRIMPLIN | Trustee | 16 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.91k | £439 | £29.31k | £40.01k | £37.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.14k | £10.52k | £24.97k | £40.03k | £32.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Aug 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN ESSEX IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, SERVICES AND TRAINING TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN CYCLING IN A SAFE ENVIRONMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Project 49
49 Alexandra Street
SOUTHEND-ON-SEA
SS1 1BW
- Phone:
- 07971774479
- Email:
- info@justridesouthend.com
- Website:
-
Justridesouthend.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window