Accounts and annual returns CLEVELAND SCHOOLS' SPORTS COUNCIL

Charity number: 512014
Charity reporting is overdue by 1771 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 310 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 310 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 676 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 676 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1041 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1041 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1406 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1406 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1771 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1771 days