Financial history KARLIN LONDON

Charity number: 1178105
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £184.76k £80.75k £179.13k £143.87k £103.74k
Total expenditure £96.97k £54.54k £65.82k £99.46k £79.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A