CARRIE’S HOME FOUNDATION CIO
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We fund organisations and charities, in the UK, who are tackling the challenges people face with homelessness and poverty. We do this through a variety of fundraising activities and the generous financial donations we receive. When funds are raised, we distribute these funds to local charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 15 October 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 October 2018: CIO registration
- 02 January 2024: Removed (Removed by application)
- 02 January 2024: Funds transferred to 1140192 PROVIDENCE ROW
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 15/10/2019 | 15/10/2020 | 15/10/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.33k | £196 | £27 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.39k | £588 | £133 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 15 October 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 15 October 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 15 October 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 15 October 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 15 October 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 October 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 15 October 2020 | 13 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 October 2020 | 13 August 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 15 October 2019 | 14 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 October 2019 | 14 August 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY AND DISTRESS, IN PARTICULAR AMONG HOMELESS PEOPLE AND AMONG THOSE IN NEED WHO ARE LIVING IN ADVERSE HOUSING CONDITIONS, BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY AND DISTRESS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window