PEOPLE FIRST FORUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our vision is a world where people with learning disabilities are treated as equals, living safe and happy lives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £100,940 from 1 government contract(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 02 May 2018: CIO registration
- 04 March 2020: Funds received from 1107700 POOLE FORUM
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jenny Phillips | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
John Harris | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Mark Williams | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shaun Hayward | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARK DYDE | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALISON BALE | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Peters | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
RUTH CROOK | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|||||
BILL SHAW | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|||||
SIMON SHAVE | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAN MURRAY | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
LES HEBDITCH | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £206.21k | £209.72k | £201.33k | £241.93k | £312.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £197.69k | £200.40k | £196.32k | £210.52k | £249.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £125.15k | N/A | £131.64k | £100.94k | |
|
Income from government grants | £128.16k | N/A | £98.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 April 2024 | 89 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 April 2024 | 89 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 02 May 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS WHO HAVE A LEARNING DISABILITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PEOPLE FIRST FORUM
Rossmore Leisure Centre
Herbert Avenue
POOLE
Dorset
BH12 4HR
- Phone:
- 01202746040
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window