HULA HOOP PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Older People: Walks in local public parks (Fairlop Waters Country Park Redbridge) with accessible pathways to enjoy a walk through the country park year round to get closer to the wildlife). Other activities will take place indoors. Young People: Sporting and recreational activities such as Holiday Multi- Sports Camps, Personal Development and Enrichment activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 October 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ejovwokoghene Ibuno | Chair | 25 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Florence Bello Osagie | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
LEON OSAHON | Trustee | 27 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2019 | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £48 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 49 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 49 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 414 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 414 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 780 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 13 June 2022 | 74 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1145 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1510 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Oct 2018 as amended on 29 May 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE AGED 55 AND OVER FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY).”
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 Slocum Close
LONDON
SE28 8LQ
- Phone:
- 07599686935
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window