Financial history STEVE BROWNE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1178821
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £17.20k £694 £18.76k £15.98k £17.88k
Total expenditure £23.92k £2.89k £11.85k £14.55k £6.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £13.28k N/A N/A