FISKERTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision and management of a village hall for the use of the inhabitants of Fiskerton and the surrounding area without distinction of political, religious or other opinions including use for meetings, lectures and classes and other forms of recreation and leisure-time occupation with the objects of improving the conditions of life for the said inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
Total income includes £2,514 from 3 government grant(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 05 January 1982: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lester Mathews | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN WALKER | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.36k | £24.28k | £16.58k | £28.45k | £28.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.01k | £18.86k | £10.14k | £24.59k | £19.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.05k | £10.10k | £8.87k | £2.51k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 27 May 2024 | 179 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 01 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATED THIRTEENTH MARCH 1968
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF FISKERTON AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES, AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF FISKERTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 Ferry Road
Fiskerton
LINCOLN
LN3 4HW
- Phone:
- 01522752117
- Email:
- marygibson14@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window