THE TRIO BRIDGE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of a holistic and evidence-based approach to healthcare in developing countries. It aims to improve and enhance both maternal and fetal health through teaching and hands-on targeted education. Training doctors and nurses to improve outcomes for mothers and babies prevention and intervention through training and information to relieve sickness Evidence-based medical practices
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Ghana
Governance
- 12 October 2018: CIO registration
- TRIO BRIDGE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- TRIO BRIDGE FOUNDATION (TRIO) (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr BRIGHT KWAME ASANTE GYAMPOH | Chair | 03 March 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
George Noi-Lartey | Trustee | 03 March 2018 |
|
|||||||||
KAREN BILLINGTON | Trustee | 03 March 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
ROSE KWARTENG | Trustee | 03 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.94k | £217 | £2.58k | £6.61k | £5.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.05k | £152 | £2.58k | £4.89k | £5.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 April 2024 | 171 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 April 2024 | 171 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 February 2022 | 101 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 February 2022 | 101 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 February 2021 | 94 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 February 2021 | 94 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Oct 2018 as amended on 24 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF PEOPLE RESIDING IN GHANA THROUGH THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL EQUIPMENT FOR THE TREATMENT OF PREGNANCY-RELATED CONDITIONS TO REDUCE MATERNAL MORTALITY RATES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
45 Raglan Avenue
WALTHAM CROSS
EN8 8DA
- Phone:
- 07949777961
- Email:
- info@thetriobridge.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window