COLCHESTER ROUGH SLEEPERS GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Colchester Rough Sleepers Group provide temporary housing via a mobile shelter for rough sleepers in North Essex and South Suffolk. We also operate a cafe to help raise funds for our mobile shelter
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
- Suffolk
Governance
- CRSG (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OF HOMELESS PEOPLE AND ROUGH SLEEPERS ON THE STREETS OF NORTHERN ESSEX AND SOUTH SUFFOLK BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT TO INDIVIDUALS ASSISTING THEM IN RESEARCHING AND ACCESSING PATHWAYS TO PERMANENT FORMS OF SUPPORTED ACCOMMODATION AND THE PROVISION OF MOBILE OR PERMANENT FACILITIES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window