THE DETECTORISTS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To conserve and preserve our national archaeological heritage including: 1. To advance the education of the public in the subject of metal detecting to archaeological principles. 2. To assist in such ways as the charity trustees think fit in supporting the recording and preservation of discovered portable antiques. 3. To identify and conserve new discoveries of an archaeological nature.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 February 2019: CIO registration
- DIF: DETECTORISTS INSTITUTE AND FOUNDATION (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JASON FRANKLIN | Trustee | 13 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
LEANNE WESTCOTT | Trustee | 13 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
NATHAN PORTLOCK-ALLAN | Trustee | 13 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
KEITH WESTCOTT | Trustee | 13 February 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/08/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 04 July 2024 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 04 July 2024 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 20 July 2021 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 20 July 2021 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Feb 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN CONSERVING AND PRESERVING OUR NATIONAL ARCHAEOLOGICAL HERITAGE INCLUDING: 1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF METAL DETECTING TO ARCHAEOLOGICAL PRINCIPLES. 2. TO ASSIST IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT IN SUPPORTING THE RECORDING AND PRESERVATION OF DISCOVERED PORTABLE ANTIQUITIES. 3. TO IDENTIFY AND CONSERVE NEW DISCOVERIES OF AN ARCHAEOLOGICAL NATURE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
61A Bridge Street
KINGTON
Herefordshire
HR5 3DJ
- Phone:
- 07767663484
- Email:
- keith@thedif.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window