Trustees NARBERTH & DISTRICT COMMUNITY & SPORTS ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 512032

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GLINYS MEREDYDD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Clare Elizabeth Davies | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Stephen Drinkwater | Trustee | 14 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Andrew Johns | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charles James Clewett | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Lucien Almaric Jenkins | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lilian Claire Dunbar | Trustee | 21 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Bowen | Trustee | 15 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mike Johns | Trustee | 30 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
William Silverstone | Trustee | 30 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Steven Haysom | Trustee | 30 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Francis Requena | Trustee | 30 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Robert Daniel John Lewis | Trustee | 17 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Steve Rigby | Trustee | 20 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES FREDERICK MEREDYDD | Trustee | 17 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
CARINA NEWHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALICE LOUISE MARY PHILLIPS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.