IMAM HUSSEIN CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1.To provide relief to the poor and victims of natural and other kinds of disaster anywhere in the world. 2. To advance the teachings of Islam as per the teachings of the Ahlul Bayt hence promoting religious harmony and respect for different faiths and beliefs. 3. Advancement of education in social and economic affairs 4. Achieve (2) and (3) by commissioning TV programmes and other media
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income:
£615,188
Donations and legacies | £615.16k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £28 |
Total expenditure:
£508,624
Raising funds | £123.90k | |
Charitable activities | £384.73k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £123.90k | |
Charitable expenditure | £384.73k | |
Retained for future use | £106.56k |
People

2 Employee(s)
3 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
- Canada
- India
- Iraq
- Kenya
- Kuwait
- Madagascar
- Mozambique
- Pakistan
- Tanzania
- United States
Governance
- 21 May 2018: CIO registration
- IMAM HUSSEIN CHARITY (Previous name)
- IMAM HUSSEIN DEVELOPMENT & RELIEF FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hassan Al-Nawab | Chair | 04 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Morteza Al-Hoseine | Trustee | 20 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
ADEL SALAH | Trustee | 15 December 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £140.64k | £222.61k | £336.51k | £567.01k | £615.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £145.27k | £162.86k | £375.07k | £529.04k | £508.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £567.01k | £615.16k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £28 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £287.34k | £384.73k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £241.70k | £123.90k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £36.09k | £27.40k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £8.40k | £117.32k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £6.52k | £200 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 May 2021
(These accounts |
21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 08 April 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 08 April 2021 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 May 2018 as amended on 15 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
A)THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG THE POOR AND VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD IN THE FORM OF MONEY (OR OTHER MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE) FOR PERSONS, BODIES, ORGANISATIONS AND/OR COUNTRIES AFFECTED INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL AID BY ARRANGING FOR THE PURCHASE AND DELIVERY OF AID TO SUCH AREAS, CO-OPERATING WITH OTHERS TO GET AID TO THE RIGHT PLACE, IDENTIFYING THE REAL NEEDS OF THOSE AFFECTED BY DISASTER AND WAYS OF MEETING THOSE NEEDS. B)TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF AHLULBAYT AS AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGIOUS HARMONY BY PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING AND RESPECT OF THE BELIEFS AND PRACTICES OF DIFFERENT RELIGIONS IN SUCH WAYS AND BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE; C)THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PEOPLE OF ALL AGE GROUPS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE, INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, BY: I)PROVIDING TUITION CLASSES, SEMINARS AND TALKS; II)SKILLS TRAINING CLASSES FOR EMPLOYMENT PURPOSES; III)MAKING GRANTS TO ORGANISATIONS WHO PROVIDE EDUCATIONAL SERVICES; D)THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONG YOUNG PEOPLE IN MATTERS OF SEX AND CONTRACEPTION AND TO DEVELOP AMONGST THEM A SENSE OF RESPONSIBILITY IN REGARD TO SEXUAL BEHAVIOUR WITH THE AIM OF PREVENTING AND MITIGATING OF THE SUFFERING CAUSED BY UNWANTED PREGNANCY, BY DIRECT HELP, ADVICE, EDUCATION AND GUIDANCE ABOUT AND ACCESS TO VARIOUS TYPES OF CONTRACEPTION OR FERTILITY TREATMENT, OR INDIRECTLY BY SUPPORTING ACADEMIC RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES AND EFFECTS OF UNWANTED PREGNANCY OR NEW METHODS OF FERTILITY TREATMENT AND PUBLISHING THAT RESEARCH. E) TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH MAY BE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
333 EDGWARE ROAD
COLINDALE
LONDON
NW9 6TD
- Phone:
- 02035151122
- Email:
- info@imamhusseincharity.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window