MEKANE SEMAET ST. ARSEMA ETHIOPIAN ORTHODOX TEWAHEDO CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ADVANCEING THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES AND REGULATIONS OF THE ETHIOPIAN ORTHODOX TEWAHEDO CHURCH FOR THE BENEFIT OF ETHIOPIAN ORTHODOX TEWAHEDO CHURCH FOLLOWERS IN THE UK AND THE REST OF THE WORLD, IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING A PLACE OR PLACES OF PUBLIC WORSHIP FOR WORSHIP AND OFFICIATING OF SACRAMENTS AND FOR PERFORMANCE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 22 June 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Seleshe Hailu Gebrye | Trustee | 26 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
HIYAW MEKURA | Trustee | 26 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Israel Behilu | Trustee | 21 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mikael Eyob | Trustee | 21 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Novel Alemu | Trustee | 21 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Meaza Shire Damtew | Trustee | 21 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Henock Addis | Trustee | 21 January 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.05k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £20.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £898 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £13.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 30 December 2023 | 305 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 29 March 2024 | 395 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 16 October 2022 | 230 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 30 December 2022 | 305 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 02 April 2021 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 08 April 2021 | 39 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 22 Jun 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH (THE ÔOBJECTSÖ) ARE: (1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES AND REGULATIONS OF THE ETHIOPIAN ORTHODOX TEWAHEDO CHURCH FOR THE BENEFIT OF ETHIOPIAN ORTHODOX TEWAHEDO CHURCH FOLLOWERS IN THE UK AND THE REST OF THE WORLD, IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING A PLACE OR PLACES OF PUBLIC WORSHIP FOR WORSHIP AND OFFICIATING OF SACRAMENTS AND FOR THE DUE PERFORMANCE OF RITES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRACTICE OF THE ETHIOPIAN ORTHODOX TEWAHEDO CHURCH. (2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE PARISH ADMINISTRATIVE COUNCIL MAY DECIDE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
722 HOLLOWAY ROAD
LONDON
N19 3NH
- Phone:
- 07496585869
- Email:
- starsemalondon@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window