WALES ORPHAN AND RARE LUNG DISEASE (WORLD)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The preservation and protection of good health for the public benefit, by promoting the awareness and understanding of rare lung disease in West Wales. WORLD promotes discussion, engagement, support, knowledge and research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 04 April 2018: CIO registration
- WALES ORPHAN AND RARE LUNG DISEASE (Previous name)
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Keir Lewis Professor | Chair | 27 February 2018 |
|
|||||
Graham Evans | Trustee | 23 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Evans | Trustee | 23 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOSEPH ANNANDALE | Trustee | 27 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
SARAH REES | Trustee | 27 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL GEMINE BSC, PhD | Trustee | 27 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.22k | £6.05k | £2.03k | £1.67k | £1.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.95k | £2.17k | £1.16k | £1.29k | £3.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 09 March 2025 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 09 March 2025 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 24 May 2024 | 113 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 24 May 2024 | 113 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 14 March 2023 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 14 March 2023 | 41 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 23 March 2022 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 23 March 2022 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN WEST WALES, SPECIFICALLY THE COUNTIES OF PEMBROKESHIRE, CEREDIGION AND CARMARTHENSHIRE, BY PROMOTING THE AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF RARE LUNG DISEASES THROUGH SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT INCLUDING: -PROVIDING A FORUM FOR RARE LUNG DISEASE PATIENTS AND THEIR CARERS TO MEET AND SHARE EXPERIENCES; -OFFERING EMOTIONAL AND EDUCATIONAL SUPPORT TO RARE LUNG DISEASE PATIENTS, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS INCLUDING SIGNPOSTING TO OTHER RELEVANT BODIES; -ENGAGING RESPIRATORY SPECIALISTS TO REFER OTHER PATIENTS TO THE FORUM;
Contact information
- Address:
-
Newton House
Llandyfan
AMMANFORD
Dyfed
SA18 2UD
- Phone:
- 07902036945
- Email:
- joinusatworld@outlook.com
- Website:
-
joinusatworld.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window