FOLKESTONE AMATEUR BOXING CLUB

Charity Number: 1179129
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We run a charitable amateur sports club serving all areas of our community

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £14,487
Total expenditure: £8,050

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 July 2018: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BARRY LEE PLUCK Chair 16 July 2018
None on record
PAUL SILLIBOURNE Trustee 16 July 2018
None on record
DEAN GARNHAM Trustee 16 July 2018
None on record
HARRY SLATER Trustee 16 July 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £13.52k £6.56k £13.24k £14.49k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £12.75k £13.40k £8.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A £4.00k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 02 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 02 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 02 February 2024 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 02 February 2024 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 14 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 March 2021 53 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
23 New Road
Saltwood
HYTHE
Kent
CT21 4QE
Phone:
07801888480