Trustees 1ST CHAPEL-EN-LE-FRITH SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 512042

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catherine Ann Pomeroy | Chair | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vicky Louise Cahill | Trustee | 10 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Samual Brindley | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Millner | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Thurgoland | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Bell | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Peter Brian Bywater | Trustee | 21 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Paul Christopher Read | Trustee | 15 May 2016 |
|
|||||
Darren Furness | Trustee | 31 December 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.