ASTERDALE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
educational and social support for the older woman
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 21 October 1981: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SANDRA WHARTON | Chair | 28 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
Helen Hogg | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jean McHale | Trustee | 15 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Booth | Trustee | 16 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Hocking | Trustee | 19 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Paton | Trustee | 19 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
BELINDA HALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEAN LIMB | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET ROBINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET KELLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.45k | £96 | £2.57k | £2.41k | £3.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.32k | £583 | £1.57k | £2.08k | £3.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES (ALREADY LODGED)
Charitable objects
THE MAIN PURPOSES OF THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION ARE TO ENABLE WOMEN WHO ARE INTERESTED IN ISSUES ASSOCIATED WITH RURAL LIFE, INCLUDING ARTS, CRAFTS AND SCIENCES, TO IMPROVE AND DEVELOP CONDITIONS OF RURAL LIFE, TO ADVANCE THEIR EDUCATION IN CITIZENSHIP, IN PUBLIC QUESTIONS BOTH NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL, IN MUSIC, DRAMA AND OTHER CULTURAL SUBJECTS AND IN ALL BRANCHES OF AGRICULTURE, HANDICRAFTS, HOME ECONOMICS, HEALTH AND SOCIAL WELFARE. IT SEEKS TO GIVE WOMEN THE OPPORTUNITY OF WORKING TOGETHER THROUGH THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION AND OF PUTTING INTO PRACTICE THOSE IDEALS FOR WHICH IT STANDS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 Stoney Lane
Spondon
DERBY
DE21 7QH
- Phone:
- 07986976340
- Email:
- helenhogg898@googlemail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window