THE BIRCH THOMPSON MEMORIAL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity maintains Gelliwig, a residential centre in Porthmadog, Gwynedd for use by groups of young people from Colton Hills School, Wolverhampton in particular, but a wider area in general. The property is available for hire by bona fide groups catering for young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gwynedd
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 24 November 1981: Standard registration
- 26 September 2022: Funds received from 1109783 KIDS ADVENTUROUS ACTIVITIES
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rakesh Kumar Kapoor | Trustee | 11 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Ian Thacker | Trustee | 11 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Willetts | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tamika Grundy | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Elizabeth Heeley | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Morris | Trustee | 12 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
PAULA MARY DAVIES | Trustee | 26 November 2014 |
|
|||||
DUANE WILLIAMS | Trustee | 26 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM GERALD O'HARA | Trustee | 24 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
DUKE ST CLAIRE JACKSON | Trustee | 30 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
JANE MARGARET STRINGER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEITH BERRY | Trustee |
|
||||||
MR JEET KUMAR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DILYS WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.01k | £19.13k | £43.78k | £31.46k | £44.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.35k | £12.82k | £36.70k | £42.32k | £22.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 OCTOBER 1981, SCHEME DATED 13TH MAY 2002 WILL EFFECT
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL TRIPS AND HOLIDAYS DESIGNED TO SUPPLEMENT AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS ATTENDING COLTON HILLS SCHOOL. FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE DEED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
80 YORK AVENUE
WOLVERHAMPTON
WV3 9BU
- Phone:
- 01902655962
- Email:
- keithoberry@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window