Financial history THE SANDWICH MEDIEVAL TRUST

Charity Number: 1178864
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023 30/11/2024
Total gross income £15.44k £26.65k £30.13k £15.05k £15.97k
Total expenditure £14.84k £19.20k £20.69k £11.66k £30.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £11.00k £1.20k £3.00k N/A N/A